AZ HB2779 | 2020 | Fifty-fourth Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 26-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 21 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-25 - Senate read second time
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 21 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-25 - Senate read second time
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
State equalization assistance; rate; appropriation
Title
State equalization assistance; rate; appropriation
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-20 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 31 N: 29 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-20 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DP) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-17 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-12 - House - House Ways & Means Committee Action (DP) (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-20 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DP) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-17 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-12 - House - House Ways & Means Committee Action (DP) (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-25 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Assigned to Senate APPROP Committee |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Assigned to Senate FIN Committee |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
2020-02-21 | Senate | Transmit to Senate |
2020-02-20 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (31-29-0-0) |
2020-02-20 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass |
2020-02-18 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2020-02-18 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2020-02-17 | House | House consent calendar |
2020-02-17 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-0-0-0) |
2020-02-12 | House | House WM Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (6-4-0-0-0-0) |
2020-02-06 | House | House read second time |
2020-02-05 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2020-02-05 | House | Assigned to House WM Committee |
2020-02-05 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |