AZ HB2758 | 2024 | Fifty-sixth Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-3)
Status: Engrossed on February 27 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-03-05 - Senate read second time
Pending: Senate Government Institutions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 27 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-03-05 - Senate read second time
Pending: Senate Government Institutions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Rare disease advisory council
Title
Rare disease advisory council
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-02-27 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 46 N: 11 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-21 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-20 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-15 - House - House Health & Human Services Committee Action (DP) (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-21 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-20 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-15 - House - House Health & Human Services Committee Action (DP) (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-05 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2024-03-04 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2024-03-04 | Senate | Assigned to Senate GOV Committee |
2024-03-04 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
2024-02-27 | Senate | Transmit to Senate |
2024-02-27 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (46-11-2-0) |
2024-02-21 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2024-02-20 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2024-02-20 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2024-02-20 | House | House consent calendar |
2024-02-20 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (9-0-0-0-0-0) |
2024-02-15 | House | House HHS Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (9-1-0-0-0-0) |
2024-02-08 | House | House read second time |
2024-02-06 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2024-02-06 | House | Assigned to House HHS Committee |
2024-02-06 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
Subjects
Arizona Rare Disease Advisory Council
Department Of Health Services (dhs)
Dhs (see Also: Department Of Health Services)
Legislative Findings
Public Health And Safety - Title 36
Rare Disease Advisory Council
Department Of Health Services (dhs)
Dhs (see Also: Department Of Health Services)
Legislative Findings
Public Health And Safety - Title 36
Rare Disease Advisory Council