AZ HB2757 | 2024 | Fifty-sixth Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Spectrum: Broadly Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 26 2024 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-03-19 - Senate APPROP Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (8-0-2-0)
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 26 2024 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-03-19 - Senate APPROP Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (8-0-2-0)
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Appropriations; Arizona Holocaust education center
Title
Appropriations; Arizona Holocaust education center
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-19 - Senate - Senate Appropriations Committee Action (DP) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-13 - Senate - Senate Education Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-26 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 51 N: 5 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-21 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-20 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-14 - House - House Appropriations Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-13 - Senate - Senate Education Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-26 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 51 N: 5 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-21 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-20 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-14 - House - House Appropriations Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-19 | Senate | Senate APPROP Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (8-0-2-0) |
2024-03-13 | Senate | Senate ED Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (7-0-0-0) |
2024-03-05 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2024-03-04 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2024-03-04 | Senate | Assigned to Senate APPROP Committee |
2024-03-04 | Senate | Assigned to Senate ED Committee |
2024-03-04 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
2024-02-26 | Senate | Transmit to Senate |
2024-02-26 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (51-5-3-0) |
2024-02-21 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2024-02-20 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2024-02-20 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2024-02-20 | House | House Committee of the Whole consent calendar |
2024-02-20 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (9-0-0-0-0-0) |
2024-02-14 | House | House APPROP Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (16-0-1-0-0-0) |
2024-02-06 | House | House read second time |
2024-02-05 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2024-02-05 | House | Assigned to House APPROP Committee |
2024-02-05 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
Subjects
Ade (see Also: Department Of Education)
Appropriation
Arizona Holocaust Education Center
Department Of Education (ade)
Appropriation
Arizona Holocaust Education Center
Department Of Education (ade)