AZ HB2736 | 2019 | Fifty-fourth Legislature 1st Regular
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-26 - Senate APPROP Committee action: do pass amended/strike-everything, voting: (7-2-0-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-26 - Senate APPROP Committee action: do pass amended/strike-everything, voting: (7-2-0-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Tobacco products; distributor licenses
Title
Tobacco products; distributor licenses
Sponsors
Rep. Ben Toma [R] | Rep. Andres Cano [D] | Rep. David Cook [R] | Rep. John Fillmore [R] |
Rep. Kevin Payne [R] | Rep. Tony Rivero [R] | Rep. Bob Thorpe [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-03-26 - Senate - Senate Appropriations Committee Action (DPA/SE) (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-04 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 36 N: 23 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-28 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-20 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-19 - House - House Commerce Committee Action (DP) (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-04 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 36 N: 23 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-28 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-20 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-19 - House - House Commerce Committee Action (DP) (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-26 | Senate | Senate APPROP Committee action: do pass amended/strike-everything, voting: (7-2-0-0) |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Assigned to Senate APPROP Committee |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Transmit to Senate |
2019-03-04 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (36-23-1-0) |
2019-02-28 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2019-02-25 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2019-02-25 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2019-02-20 | House | House consent calendar |
2019-02-20 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (5-1-0-2-0-0) |
2019-02-19 | House | House COM Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (6-2-0-1-0-0) |
2019-02-14 | House | House read second time |
2019-02-13 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2019-02-13 | House | Assigned to House COM Committee |
2019-02-13 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |