AZ HB2722 | 2024 | Fifty-sixth Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 26 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-03-13 - Senate MAPS Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (7-0-0-0)
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 26 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-03-13 - Senate MAPS Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (7-0-0-0)
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
National guard; life insurance
Title
National guard; life insurance
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-13 - Senate - Senate Military Affairs, Public Safety and Border Security Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-26 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 55 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-21 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DP) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-20 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-12 - House - House Military Affairs & Public Safety Committee Action (DP) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-26 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 55 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-21 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DP) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-20 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-12 - House - House Military Affairs & Public Safety Committee Action (DP) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-13 | Senate | Senate MAPS Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (7-0-0-0) |
2024-03-05 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2024-03-04 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2024-03-04 | Senate | Assigned to Senate MAPS Committee |
2024-03-04 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
2024-02-26 | Senate | Transmit to Senate |
2024-02-26 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (55-1-3-0) |
2024-02-21 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass |
2024-02-20 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2024-02-20 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2024-02-20 | House | House consent calendar |
2024-02-20 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (9-0-0-0-0-0) |
2024-02-12 | House | House MAPS Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (14-0-0-1-0-0) |
2024-02-05 | House | House read second time |
2024-02-01 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2024-02-01 | House | Assigned to House MAPS Committee |
2024-02-01 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |