AZ HB2709 | 2022 | Fifty-fifth Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 30 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-30 - Chapter 100
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 30 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-30 - Chapter 100
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Victim's right to privacy; exception
Title
Victim's right to privacy; exception
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-24 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 20 N: 7 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-21 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-17 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee Action (DP) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-23 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-21 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-16 - House - House Judiciary Committee Action (DP) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-21 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-17 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee Action (DP) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-23 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-21 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-16 - House - House Judiciary Committee Action (DP) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-30 | Senate | Chapter 100 |
2022-03-30 | Senate | Governor Signed |
2022-03-28 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2022-03-24 | House | Transmit to House |
2022-03-24 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (20-7-3-0) |
2022-03-22 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2022-03-22 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2022-03-21 | Senate | Senate consent calendar |
2022-03-21 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2022-03-17 | Senate | Senate JUD Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (8-0-0-0) |
2022-03-01 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2022-02-28 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2022-02-28 | Senate | Assigned to Senate JUD Committee |
2022-02-28 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
2022-02-24 | Senate | Transmit to Senate |
2022-02-23 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (59-0-1-0) |
2022-02-21 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2022-02-21 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2022-02-21 | House | House consent calendar |
2022-02-21 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-0-0-0) |
2022-02-16 | House | House JUD Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (10-0-0-0-0-0) |
2022-02-08 | House | House read second time |
2022-02-07 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2022-02-07 | House | Assigned to House JUD Committee |
2022-02-07 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
Subjects
Crime Victims' Rights
Criminal Code - Title 13
Definitions (s)
Exception (s)
Exceptions
Victim's Right To Privacy (s)
Victims' Privacy
Criminal Code - Title 13
Definitions (s)
Exception (s)
Exceptions
Victim's Right To Privacy (s)
Victims' Privacy