AZ HB2696 | 2022 | Fifty-fifth Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 31-2)
Status: Passed on April 28 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-28 - Chapter 197
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 31-2)
Status: Passed on April 28 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-28 - Chapter 197
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Mandatory sentences; children; trafficking; smuggling
Title
Mandatory sentences; children; trafficking; smuggling
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-25 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 37 N: 20 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-25 - House - House - Concurrence (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-20 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 17 N: 11 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-20 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-13 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (RETAINED) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-31 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (RETAINED) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-14 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-10 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee Action (DP) (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2022-02-23 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 55 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-21 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-16 - House - House Judiciary Committee Action (DP) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-04-25 - House - House - Concurrence (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-20 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 17 N: 11 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-20 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-13 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (RETAINED) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-31 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (RETAINED) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-14 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-10 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee Action (DP) (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2022-02-23 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 55 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-21 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-16 - House - House Judiciary Committee Action (DP) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-28 | Senate | Chapter 197 |
2022-04-28 | Senate | Governor Signed |
2022-04-25 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2022-04-25 | House | House final reading PASSED, voting: (37-20-3-0) |
2022-04-25 | House | House concurs |
2022-04-25 | House | House minority caucus: Conference |
2022-04-25 | House | House Conference Committee recommended |
2022-04-20 | House | Transmit to House |
2022-04-20 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (17-11-2-0) |
2022-04-20 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2022-04-13 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Retained |
2022-03-31 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Retained |
2022-03-15 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2022-03-15 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2022-03-14 | Senate | Senate consent calendar |
2022-03-14 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2022-03-10 | Senate | Senate JUD Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (4-3-1-0) |
2022-03-01 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2022-02-28 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2022-02-28 | Senate | Assigned to Senate JUD Committee |
2022-02-28 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
2022-02-24 | Senate | Transmit to Senate |
2022-02-23 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (55-4-1-0) |
2022-02-21 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2022-02-21 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2022-02-21 | House | House consent calendar |
2022-02-21 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-0-0-0) |
2022-02-16 | House | House JUD Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (9-0-0-1-0-0) |
2022-02-09 | House | House read second time |
2022-02-08 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2022-02-08 | House | Assigned to House JUD Committee |
2022-02-08 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
Subjects
Children
Criminal Code - Title 13
Detention (s)
Mandatory Sentences (s)
Mandatory Sentencing
Prisons And Prisoners - Title 31
Sentencing
Smuggling
State Government - Title 41
Trafficking
Criminal Code - Title 13
Detention (s)
Mandatory Sentences (s)
Mandatory Sentencing
Prisons And Prisoners - Title 31
Sentencing
Smuggling
State Government - Title 41
Trafficking
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
13 | 1308 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
13 | 1428 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
13 | 2319 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
13 | 2323 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
13 | 3205 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
13 | 3207 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
13 | 3554 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
13 | 3560 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
13 | 3625 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
13 | 705 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
31 | 412 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
41 | 1604.11 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
41 | 1604.13 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |