AZ HB2683 | 2020 | Fifty-fourth Legislature 2nd Regular

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 28 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-02-28 - Transmit to Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Anti-semitism; crime reporting; aggravating factor

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Anti-semitism; crime reporting; aggravating factor

Sponsors

Rep. Alma Hernandez [D]Rep. John Allen [R]Rep. Richard Andrade [D]Sen. Nancy Barto [R]
Rep. Leo Biasiucci [R]Rep. Walter Blackman [R]Rep. Isela Blanc [D]Rep. Reginald Bolding [D]
Rep. Shawnna Bolick [R]Rep. Russell Bowers [R]Rep. Kelli Butler [D]Rep. Noel Campbell [R]
Rep. Andres Cano [D]Rep. Frank Carroll [R]Rep. Cesar Chavez [D]Rep. Regina Cobb [R]
Rep. David Cook [R]Rep. Domingo Degrazia [D]Rep. Timothy Dunn [R]Rep. Kirsten Engel [D]
Rep. Denise Epstein [D]Rep. Diego Espinoza [D]Rep. Charlene Fernandez [D]Rep. John Fillmore [R]
Rep. Mark Finchem [R]Rep. Rosanna Gabaldon [D]Sen. Gail Griffin [R]Rep. Daniel Hernandez [D]
Rep. Jennifer Jermaine [D]Sen. John Kavanagh [R]Rep. Anthony Kern [R]Rep. Jay Lawrence [R]
Rep. Aaron Lieberman [D]Rep. Jennifer Longdon [D]Rep. Robert Meza [D]Rep. Becky Nutt [R]
Rep. Joanne Osborne [R]Rep. Jennifer Pawlik [D]Rep. Kevin Payne [R]Rep. Geraldine Peten [D]
Rep. Stephen Pierce [R]Rep. Pamela Hannley [D]Rep. Tony Rivero [R]Rep. Bret Roberts [R]
Rep. Diego Rodriguez [D]Rep. Amish Shah [D]Rep. Thomas Shope [R]Rep. Lorenzo Sierra [D]
Rep. Arlando Teller [D]Rep. Raquel Teran [D]Rep. Bob Thorpe [R]Rep. Ben Toma [R]
Rep. Kelly Townsend [R]Rep. Myron Tsosie [D]Rep. Michelle Udall [R]Rep. Jeff Weninger [R]
Sen. Sylvia Allen [R]Rep. Lela Alston [D]Sen. Sonny Borrelli [R]Sen. Sean Bowie [D]
Sen. Paul Boyer [R]Sen. David Bradley [D]Sen. Kate Brophy McGee [R]Rep. Heather Carter [R]
Sen. Lupe Contreras [D]Sen. Andrea Dalessandro [D]Rep. Karen Fann [R]Sen. David Farnsworth [R]
Rep. Sally Gonzales [D]Sen. David Gowan [R]Rep. Rick Gray [R]Sen. Sine Kerr [R]
Sen. Vince Leach [R]Sen. David Livingston [R]Rep. Javan Mesnard [R]Sen. Tony Navarrete [D]
Sen. Lisa Otondo [D]Sen. Tyler Pace [R]Sen. Jamescita Peshlakai [D]Sen. Martin Quezada [D]
Rep. Rebecca Rios [D]Sen. Victoria Steele [D]Sen. Michelle Ugenti-Rita [R]

Roll Calls

2020-02-27 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 52 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-27 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DP) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-17 - House - House Rules Committee Action (DISC/HELD) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-12 - House - House Judiciary Committee Action (DP) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-28SenateTransmit to Senate
2020-02-27HouseHouse third reading PASSED voting: (52-8-0-0)
2020-02-27HouseHouse Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass
2020-02-27HouseHouse minority caucus: Do pass
2020-02-27HouseHouse majority caucus: Do pass
2020-02-27HouseHouse RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (4-3-0-1-0-0)
2020-02-12HouseHouse JUD Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (10-0-0-0-0-0)
2020-01-30HouseHouse read second time
2020-01-29HouseAssigned to House RULES Committee
2020-01-29HouseAssigned to House JUD Committee
2020-01-29HouseIntroduced in House and read first time

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
411750Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Arizona State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback