AZ HB2666 | 2016 | Fifty-second Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 19 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-19 - Chapter 372 W/O
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 19 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-19 - Chapter 372 W/O
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Governor's economic opportunity office; consolidation
Title
Governor's economic opportunity office; consolidation
Sponsors
Sen. Karen Fann [R] |
Roll Calls
2016-05-04 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 39 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-04 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 39 N: 20 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-03 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-16 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Action (DP) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-14 - Senate - Senate Commerce and Workforce Development Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-03 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 33 N: 19 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-29 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-17 - House - House Commerce Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-04 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 39 N: 20 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-03 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-16 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Action (DP) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-14 - Senate - Senate Commerce and Workforce Development Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-03 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 33 N: 19 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-29 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-17 - House - House Commerce Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-19 | Chapter 372 W/O | |
2016-05-19 | Governor Signed | |
2016-05-05 | Transmitted to Governor | |
2016-05-04 | House | House final reading , voting: (39-20-1-0) |
2016-05-04 | House | House Concurrence PASSED, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2016-05-04 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2016-05-04 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2016-05-03 | Senate | Transmit to House |
2016-05-03 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (30-0-0-0) |
2016-05-02 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2016-04-18 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2016-04-18 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2016-04-18 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration Amended |
2016-03-07 | Senate | Referred to Senate RULES Committee |
2016-03-16 | Senate | Senate FIN Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (5-0-0-0) |
2016-03-07 | Senate | Referred to Senate FIN Committee |
2016-03-14 | Senate | Senate CWD Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (8-0-1-0) |
2016-03-08 | Senate | Referred to Senate CWD Committee |
2016-03-08 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2016-03-07 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2016-03-07 | Senate | Assigned to Senate FIN Committee |
2016-03-07 | Senate | Assigned to Senate CWD Committee |
2016-03-07 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
2016-03-04 | House | Transmit to Senate |
2016-03-03 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (33-19-8-0) |
2016-03-03 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2016-03-01 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2016-03-01 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2016-02-29 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (9-0-0-0-0) |
2016-02-11 | House | Referred to House RULES Committee |
2016-02-23 | House | House APPROP Committee action: Withdrawn |
2016-02-11 | House | Referred to House APPROP Committee |
2016-02-17 | House | House COM Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (6-2-0-0-0) |
2016-02-15 | House | Referred to House COM Committee |
2016-02-15 | House | House read second time |
2016-02-11 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2016-02-11 | House | Assigned to House APPROP Committee |
2016-02-11 | House | Assigned to House COM Committee |
2016-02-11 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |