AZ HB2664 | 2014 | Fifty-first Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Vetoed on April 30 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-30 - Governor Vetoed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on April 30 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-30 - Governor Vetoed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Income tax revisions
Title
Income tax revisions
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-04-24 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 52 N: 4 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-21 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 22 N: 1 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-19 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-06 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 50 N: 8 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-03 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-02-17 - House - House Ways and Means Committee Action (DP) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-04-21 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 22 N: 1 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-19 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-06 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 50 N: 8 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-03 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-02-17 - House - House Ways and Means Committee Action (DP) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-30 | Governor Vetoed | |
2014-04-24 | Transmitted to Governor | |
2014-04-24 | House | House final reading , voting: (52-4-4-0) |
2014-04-24 | House | House Concurrence PASSED, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2014-04-21 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2014-04-21 | House | House majority caucus: Hold |
2014-04-21 | Senate | Transmit to House |
2014-04-21 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (22-1-7-0) |
2014-04-17 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2014-04-14 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2014-04-14 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2014-04-09 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration Amended |
2014-03-10 | Senate | Referred to Senate RULES Committee |
2014-03-19 | Senate | Senate FIN Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (7-0-0-0) |
2014-03-11 | Senate | Referred to Senate FIN Committee |
2014-03-11 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2014-03-10 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2014-03-10 | Senate | Assigned to Senate FIN Committee |
2014-03-10 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
2014-03-07 | House | Transmit to Senate |
2014-03-06 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (50-8-2-0) |
2014-03-06 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass |
2014-03-04 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2014-03-04 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2014-03-03 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-1-0) |
2014-02-12 | House | Referred to House RULES Committee |
2014-02-17 | House | House WM Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (6-0-0-2-0) |
2014-02-13 | House | Referred to House WM Committee |
2014-02-13 | House | House read second time |
2014-02-12 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2014-02-12 | House | Assigned to House WM Committee |
2014-02-12 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |