AZ HB2663 | 2014 | Fifty-first Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-23 - Senate third reading FAILED voting: (13-12-5-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-23 - Senate third reading FAILED voting: (13-12-5-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
State budget; consensus forecast
Title
State budget; consensus forecast
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-04-23 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 13 N: 12 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-03-25 - Senate - Senate Appropriations Committee Action (DP) (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-06 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 23 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-03 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-02-19 - House - House Appropriations Committee Action (DP) (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-03-25 - Senate - Senate Appropriations Committee Action (DP) (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-06 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 23 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-03 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-02-19 - House - House Appropriations Committee Action (DP) (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-23 | Senate | Senate third reading FAILED voting: (13-12-5-0) |
2014-04-17 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass |
2014-04-14 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2014-04-14 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2014-04-14 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration |
2014-03-10 | Senate | Referred to Senate RULES Committee |
2014-03-25 | Senate | Senate APPROP Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (5-2-2-0) |
2014-03-11 | Senate | Referred to Senate APPROP Committee |
2014-03-11 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2014-03-10 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2014-03-10 | Senate | Assigned to Senate APPROP Committee |
2014-03-10 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
2014-03-07 | House | Transmit to Senate |
2014-03-06 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (35-23-2-0) |
2014-03-06 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass |
2014-03-04 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2014-03-04 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2014-03-03 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-1-0) |
2014-02-12 | House | Referred to House RULES Committee |
2014-02-19 | House | House APPROP Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (6-3-0-2-0) |
2014-02-13 | House | Referred to House APPROP Committee |
2014-02-13 | House | House read second time |
2014-02-12 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2014-02-12 | House | Assigned to House APPROP Committee |
2014-02-12 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |