AZ HB2662 | 2022 | Fifty-fifth Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Introduced on February 3 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-16 - House Committee action: Held, voting: (0-0-0-0-0-0)
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 3 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-16 - House Committee action: Held, voting: (0-0-0-0-0-0)
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibitions; digital application distribution platforms
Title
Prohibitions; digital application distribution platforms
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-16 - House - House Judiciary Committee Action (HELD) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-09 - House - House Judiciary Committee Action (FAILED) (Y: 4 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2022-02-09 - House - House Judiciary Committee Action (FAILED) (Y: 4 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-16 | House | House Committee action: Held, voting: (0-0-0-0-0-0) |
2022-02-09 | House | House JUD Committee action: Failed To Pass, voting: (4-5-1-0-0-0) |
2022-02-07 | House | House read second time |
2022-02-03 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2022-02-03 | House | Assigned to House Committee |
2022-02-03 | House | Assigned to House JUD Committee |
2022-02-03 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |