AZ HB2662 | 2014 | Fifty-first Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-19 - Referred to Senate RULES Committee
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-19 - Referred to Senate RULES Committee
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Schools; sexual abuse; informational handbook
Title
Schools; sexual abuse; informational handbook
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-20 - Senate - Senate Education Accountability and Reform Committee Action (DP) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-19 - Senate - Senate Public Safety Committee Action (DP) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-05 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-26 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-02-17 - House - House Education Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-03-19 - Senate - Senate Public Safety Committee Action (DP) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-05 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-26 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-02-17 - House - House Education Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-19 | Senate | Referred to Senate RULES Committee |
2014-03-19 | Senate | Senate PS Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (6-0-1-0) |
2014-03-10 | Senate | Referred to Senate PS Committee |
2014-03-20 | Senate | Senate ED Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (9-0-0-0) |
2014-03-11 | Senate | Referred to Senate ED Committee |
2014-03-11 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2014-03-10 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2014-03-10 | Senate | Assigned to Senate PS Committee |
2014-03-10 | Senate | Assigned to Senate ED Committee |
2014-03-10 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
2014-03-05 | House | Transmit to Senate |
2014-03-05 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (58-0-2-0) |
2014-03-03 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2014-02-27 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2014-02-27 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2014-02-26 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (7-0-0-2-0) |
2014-02-12 | House | Referred to House RULES Committee |
2014-02-17 | House | House ED Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (6-2-0-1-0) |
2014-02-13 | House | Referred to House ED Committee |
2014-02-13 | House | House read second time |
2014-02-12 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2014-02-12 | House | Assigned to House ED Committee |
2014-02-12 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |