AZ HB2653 | 2018 | Fifty-third Legislature 2nd Regular
Note: Replaces legislation SB1535
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 16 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-16 - Chapter 325
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 16 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-16 - Chapter 325
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Expenditure limitation; waiver of penalties
Title
Expenditure limitation; waiver of penalties
Sponsors
Rep. Regina Cobb [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-05-03 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 8 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-03 - Senate - Motion HB 2653 substituted for SB 1535 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-03 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 31 N: 29 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-03 - Senate - Motion HB 2653 substituted for SB 1535 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-03 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 31 N: 29 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-16 | Senate | Chapter 325 |
2018-05-16 | Senate | Governor Signed |
2018-05-04 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2018-05-03 | House | Transmit to House |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (21-8-1-0) |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Senate miscellaneous motion: HB 2653 substituted for SB 1535 |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Transmit to Senate |
2018-05-03 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (31-29-0-0) |
2018-05-01 | House | House read second time |
2018-04-30 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
Same As/Similar To
SB1535 (Replaces) 2018-05-03 - Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass