AZ HB2642 | 2022 | Fifty-fifth Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 24 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-01 - Senate read second time
Pending: Senate Health and Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 24 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-01 - Senate read second time
Pending: Senate Health and Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Custody; parenting time; child preference
Title
Custody; parenting time; child preference
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-23 - House - Motion Representative Toma motioned that pursuant to House Rule 12(O) HB 2642 be referred for an additional Committee of the Whole for purposes of further amending. Motion passed v/v. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-23 - House - Motion (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-23 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 53 N: 5 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-23 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-14 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-09 - House - House Judiciary Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-23 - House - Motion (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-23 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 53 N: 5 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-23 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-14 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-09 - House - House Judiciary Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-01 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2022-02-28 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2022-02-28 | Senate | Assigned to Senate HHS Committee |
2022-02-28 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
2022-02-24 | Senate | Transmit to Senate |
2022-02-23 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (53-5-2-0) |
2022-02-23 | House | House additional Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2022-02-23 | House | House refer to additional Committee of the Whole |
2022-02-15 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2022-02-15 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2022-02-14 | House | House consent calendar |
2022-02-14 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (7-0-0-1-0-0) |
2022-02-09 | House | House JUD Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (7-3-0-0-0-0) |
2022-02-02 | House | House read second time |
2022-02-01 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2022-02-01 | House | Assigned to House JUD Committee |
2022-02-01 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
25 | 403 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
25 | 405 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |