AZ HB2642 | 2016 | Fifty-second Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 35-16)
Status: Engrossed on February 9 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-08 - Referred to Senate RULES Committee
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 9 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-08 - Referred to Senate RULES Committee
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
JTED restoration and reforms.
Title
JTED restoration and reforms.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-02-09 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-08 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-02-08 - House - House Education Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-08 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-02-08 - House - House Education Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-08 | Senate | Referred to Senate RULES Committee |
2016-05-07 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2016-05-07 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
2016-02-09 | House | Transmit to Senate |
2016-02-09 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (58-0-2-0) |
2016-02-09 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2016-02-09 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2016-02-09 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2016-02-08 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (7-0-0-2-0) |
2016-02-04 | House | Referred to House RULES Committee |
2016-02-08 | House | House ED Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (7-0-0-0-0) |
2016-02-08 | House | Referred to House ED Committee |
2016-02-08 | House | House read second time |
2016-02-04 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2016-02-04 | House | Assigned to House ED Committee |
2016-02-04 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |