AZ HB2636 | 2022 | Fifty-fifth Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 26-0)
Status: Introduced on February 3 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-21 - House APPROP Committee action: Failed To Pass, voting: (4-6-2-1-0-0)
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 3 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-21 - House APPROP Committee action: Failed To Pass, voting: (4-6-2-1-0-0)
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Appropriation; retention; certified peace officers
Title
Appropriation; retention; certified peace officers
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-21 - House - House Appropriations Committee Action (FAILED) (Y: 4 N: 6 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2022-02-14 - House - House Military Affairs & Public Safety Committee Action (DP) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-14 - House - House Military Affairs & Public Safety Committee Action (DP) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-21 | House | House APPROP Committee action: Failed To Pass, voting: (4-6-2-1-0-0) |
2022-02-14 | House | House MAPS Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (13-0-2-0-0-0) |
2022-02-07 | House | House read second time |
2022-02-03 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2022-02-03 | House | Assigned to House APPROP Committee |
2022-02-03 | House | Assigned to House MAPS Committee |
2022-02-03 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |