AZ HB2617 | 2024 | Fifty-sixth Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 13-6)
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-03-11 - Senate read second time
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-03-11 - Senate read second time
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Juvenile restoration of civil rights
Title
Juvenile restoration of civil rights
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-04 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 51 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-04 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-04 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-12 - House - House Military Affairs & Public Safety Committee Action (DP) (Y: 13 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-06 - House - House Judiciary Committee Action (W/D) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-04 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-04 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-12 - House - House Military Affairs & Public Safety Committee Action (DP) (Y: 13 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-06 - House - House Judiciary Committee Action (W/D) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-11 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Assigned to Senate JUD Committee |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
2024-03-04 | Senate | Transmit to Senate |
2024-03-04 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (51-9-0-0) |
2024-03-04 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2024-03-04 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2024-03-04 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2024-03-04 | House | House consent calendar |
2024-03-04 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (9-0-0-0-0-0) |
2024-02-12 | House | House MAPS Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (13-1-1-0-0-0) |
2024-02-06 | House | House JUD Committee action: Withdrawn, voting: (0-0-0-0-0-0) |
2024-01-24 | House | House read second time |
2024-01-23 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2024-01-23 | House | Assigned to House MAPS Committee |
2024-01-23 | House | Assigned to House JUD Committee |
2024-01-23 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
Subjects
Adjc (see Also: Department Of Juvenile Corrections)
Children - Title 8
Department Of Juvenile Corrections (adjc)
Juvenile Court
Juvenile Restoration Of Civil Rights
Children - Title 8
Department Of Juvenile Corrections (adjc)
Juvenile Court
Juvenile Restoration Of Civil Rights