AZ HB2617 | 2019 | Fifty-fourth Legislature 1st Regular

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Vetoed on June 7 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-07 - Governor Vetoed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Renewable energy storage equipment; valuation

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Renewable energy storage equipment; valuation

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-27 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 48 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-27 - House - House - Concurrence (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-24 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 22 N: 4 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-22 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-22 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-13 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-04 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 48 N: 10 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-28 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DP) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-26 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (RET ON CAL) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-25 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-20 - House - House Appropriations Committee Action (DP) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-18 - House - House Ways & Means Committee Action (W/D) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-07 Governor Vetoed
2019-05-27 Transmitted to Governor
2019-05-27HouseHouse final reading PASSED, voting: (48-12-0-0)
2019-05-27HouseHouse concurs
2019-05-27HouseHouse minority caucus: Conference
2019-05-27HouseHouse Conference Committee recommended
2019-05-24HouseTransmit to House
2019-05-24SenateSenate third reading PASSED voting: (22-4-4-0)
2019-05-22SenateSenate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
2019-04-23SenateSenate majority caucus: Do pass
2019-04-23SenateSenate minority caucus: Do pass
2019-04-22SenateSenate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0)
2019-03-13SenateSenate FIN Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (9-0-1-0)
2019-03-07SenateSenate read second time
2019-03-06SenateAssigned to Senate RULES Committee
2019-03-06SenateAssigned to Senate FIN Committee
2019-03-06SenateIntroduced in Senate and read first time
2019-03-05SenateTransmit to Senate
2019-03-04HouseHouse third reading PASSED voting: (48-10-2-0)
2019-02-28HouseHouse Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass
2019-02-26HouseHouse Committee of the Whole action: Retained on the Calendar
2019-02-26HouseHouse minority caucus: Do pass
2019-02-26HouseHouse majority caucus: Do pass
2019-02-25HouseHouse RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-0-0-0)
2019-02-20HouseHouse APPROP Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (10-0-0-1-0-0)
2019-02-18HouseHouse WM Committee action: Withdrawn, voting: (0-0-0-0-0-0)
2019-02-13HouseHouse read second time
2019-02-12HouseAssigned to House RULES Committee
2019-02-12HouseAssigned to House APPROP Committee
2019-02-12HouseAssigned to House WM Committee
2019-02-12HouseIntroduced in House and read first time

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
11254.07Amended CodeSee Bill Text
4214151Amended CodeSee Bill Text
4214155Amended CodeSee Bill Text
425061Amended CodeSee Bill Text
425159Amended CodeSee Bill Text
9499.14Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Arizona State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/BillOverview/72253
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/1r/bills/hb2617p.htm
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/1r/bills/hb2617h.htm
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/1r/bills/hb2617s.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/1r/proposed/s.26171036.docx.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/1r/adopted/s.2617fin.docx.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/1r/adopted/s.2617floormesnard2.docx.htm
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=72253&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#0
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=72253&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#1
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=72253&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#2
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=72253&billStatusActionId=187080&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=72253&billStatusActionId=187374&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=72253&billStatusActionId=187663&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=72253&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#3
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=72253&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#4
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=72253&billStatusActionId=189715&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=72253&billStatusActionId=189780&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=72253&billStatusActionId=189880&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=72253&billStatusActionId=189887&includeVotes=true

Bill Comments

feedback