AZ HB2617 | 2016 | Fifty-second Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 38-4)
Status: Passed on March 17 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-17 - Chapter 46
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 38-4)
Status: Passed on March 17 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-17 - Chapter 46
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Israel; boycotts; contracts; investments
Title
Israel; boycotts; contracts; investments
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-03-14 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 42 N: 16 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-10 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 23 N: 6 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-09 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-02 - Senate - Senate Government Institutions Committee Action (DP) (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-01 - Senate - Senate Federalism, Mandates and Fiscal Responsibility Committee Action (DP) (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-17 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 46 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-15 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2016-02-10 - House - House Federalism and States' Rights Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2016-03-10 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 23 N: 6 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-09 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-02 - Senate - Senate Government Institutions Committee Action (DP) (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-01 - Senate - Senate Federalism, Mandates and Fiscal Responsibility Committee Action (DP) (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-17 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 46 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-15 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2016-02-10 - House - House Federalism and States' Rights Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-17 | Chapter 46 | |
2016-03-17 | Governor Signed | |
2016-03-14 | Transmitted to Governor | |
2016-03-14 | House | House final reading , voting: (42-16-2-0) |
2016-03-14 | House | House Concurrence PASSED, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2016-03-14 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2016-03-14 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Transmit to House |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (23-6-1-0) |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration |
2016-02-18 | Senate | Referred to Senate RULES Committee |
2016-03-09 | Senate | Senate FIN Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (4-1-0-0) |
2016-02-18 | Senate | Referred to Senate FIN Committee |
2016-03-01 | Senate | Senate FMFR Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (5-2-0-0) |
2016-02-18 | Senate | Referred to Senate FMFR Committee |
2016-03-02 | Senate | Senate GOV Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (5-1-1-0) |
2016-02-22 | Senate | Referred to Senate GOV Committee |
2016-02-22 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2016-02-18 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2016-02-18 | Senate | Assigned to Senate FIN Committee |
2016-02-18 | Senate | Assigned to Senate FMFR Committee |
2016-02-18 | Senate | Assigned to Senate GOV Committee |
2016-02-18 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
2016-02-17 | House | Transmit to Senate |
2016-02-17 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (46-14-0-0) |
2016-02-17 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2016-02-16 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2016-02-16 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2016-02-15 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (6-0-0-3-0) |
2016-02-04 | House | Referred to House RULES Committee |
2016-02-10 | House | House FSR Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (6-0-0-3-0) |
2016-02-08 | House | Referred to House FSR Committee |
2016-02-08 | House | House read second time |
2016-02-04 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2016-02-04 | House | Assigned to House FSR Committee |
2016-02-04 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |