AZ HB2616 | 2019 | Fifty-fourth Legislature 1st Regular

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 18 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-09 - Senate motion to reconsider third reading
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Registration of voters; payment; prohibition

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Registration of voters; payment; prohibition

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-09 - Senate - Senate - Reconsider Third Reading (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-08 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 12 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-04-17 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-01 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFCA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-28 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-18 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 31 N: 27 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-18 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-12 - House - House - Reconsider Third Reading (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-11 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 32 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-03-11 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-04 - House - House Rules Committee Action (DISC/HELD) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-19 - House - House Elections Committee Action (DP) (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-09SenateSenate motion to reconsider third reading
2019-05-08SenateSenate third reading FAILED voting: (12-18-0-0)
2019-04-17SenateSenate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
2019-04-02SenateSenate majority caucus: Do pass
2019-04-02SenateSenate minority caucus: Do pass
2019-04-01SenateSenate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration Amended, voting: (0-0-0-0)
2019-03-28SenateSenate JUD Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (4-2-1-0)
2019-03-21SenateSenate read second time
2019-03-19SenateAssigned to Senate RULES Committee
2019-03-19SenateAssigned to Senate JUD Committee
2019-03-19SenateIntroduced in Senate and read first time
2019-03-18SenateTransmit to Senate
2019-03-18HouseHouse third reading PASSED voting: (31-27-2-0)
2019-03-18HouseHouse additional Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
2019-03-12HouseHouse motion to reconsider third reading
2019-03-11HouseHouse third reading FAILED voting: (28-32-0-0)
2019-03-11HouseHouse Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
2019-03-07HouseHouse minority caucus: Do pass
2019-03-07HouseHouse majority caucus: Do pass
2019-03-06HouseHouse RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (5-3-0-0-0-0)
2019-02-19HouseHouse ELECT Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (6-4-0-0-0-0)
2019-02-13HouseHouse read second time
2019-02-12HouseAssigned to House RULES Committee
2019-02-12HouseAssigned to House ELECT Committee
2019-02-12HouseIntroduced in House and read first time

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
16132New CodeSee Bill Text
16134Amended CodeSee Bill Text
16184Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Arizona State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/BillOverview/72252
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/1r/bills/hb2616p.htm
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/1r/bills/hb2616h.htm
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/1r/bills/hb2616s.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/1r/proposed/s.26161016.docx.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/1r/adopted/s.2616jud.docx.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/1r/adopted/s.2616rules.docx.htm
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=72252&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#0
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=72252&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#1
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=72252&billStatusActionId=188148&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=72252&billStatusActionId=188151&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=72252&billStatusActionId=188294&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=72252&billStatusActionId=188420&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=72252&billStatusActionId=188419&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=72252&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#2
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=72252&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#3
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=72252&billStatusActionId=188998&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=72252&billStatusActionId=189474&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=72252&billStatusActionId=189515&includeVotes=true

Bill Comments

feedback