AZ HB2613 | 2016 | Fifty-second Legislature 2nd Regular

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 12-0)
Status: Passed on May 19 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-19 - Chapter 371
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Regulatory boards; licensing; revisions

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Regulatory boards; licensing; revisions

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2016-05-06 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 34 N: 20 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-05 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 19 N: 10 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-14 - Senate - Senate Commerce and Workforce Development Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-03 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 31 N: 20 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-29 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-17 - House - House Commerce Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2016-05-19 Chapter 371
2016-05-19 Governor Signed
2016-05-06 Transmitted to Governor
2016-05-06HouseHouse final reading , voting: (34-20-6-0)
2016-05-06HouseHouse Concurrence PASSED, voting: (0-0-0-0)
2016-05-05HouseHouse minority caucus: Do pass
2016-05-05HouseHouse majority caucus: Do pass
2016-05-05SenateTransmit to House
2016-05-05SenateSenate third reading PASSED voting: (19-10-1-0)
2016-04-06SenateSenate Committee of the Whole action: Retained
2016-03-29SenateSenate majority caucus: Do pass
2016-03-29SenateSenate minority caucus: Do pass
2016-03-28SenateSenate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration Amended with Recommendation for a Floor Amendment
2016-03-07SenateReferred to Senate RULES Committee
2016-03-14SenateSenate CWD Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (5-3-1-0)
2016-03-08SenateReferred to Senate CWD Committee
2016-03-08SenateSenate read second time
2016-03-07SenateAssigned to Senate RULES Committee
2016-03-07SenateAssigned to Senate CWD Committee
2016-03-07SenateIntroduced in Senate and read first time
2016-03-04HouseTransmit to Senate
2016-03-03HouseHouse third reading PASSED voting: (31-20-9-0)
2016-03-02HouseHouse Committee of the Whole action: Retained on the Calendar
2016-03-01HouseHouse majority caucus: Do pass
2016-03-01HouseHouse minority caucus: Do pass
2016-02-29HouseHouse RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (9-0-0-0-0)
2016-02-08HouseReferred to House RULES Committee
2016-02-17HouseHouse COM Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (5-3-0-0-0)
2016-02-09HouseReferred to House COM Committee
2016-02-09HouseHouse read second time
2016-02-08HouseAssigned to House RULES Committee
2016-02-08HouseAssigned to House COM Committee
2016-02-08HouseIntroduced in House and read first time

Arizona State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.azleg.gov/DocumentsForBill.asp?Session_ID=115&Bill_Number=HB2613
Texthttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/52leg/2r/bills/hb2613p.htm
Texthttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/52leg/2r/bills/hb2613h.htm
Texthttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/52leg/2r/bills/hb2613s.htm
Texthttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/52leg/2r/laws/0371.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/52leg/2r/proposed/h.2613petersen2.doc.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/52leg/2r/proposed/h.2613petersen3.doc.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/52leg/2r/proposed/h.2613petersen.doc.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/52leg/2r/adopted/h.2613commerce.doc.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/52leg/2r/proposed/s.26130211.doc.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/52leg/2r/adopted/s.2613cwd.doc.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/52leg/2r/adopted/s.2613rul.doc.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/52leg/2r/adopted/2613donahue1124.doc.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/52leg/2r/adopted/2613worsley0914.doc.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/52leg/2r/adopted/2613donahue534.doc.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/52leg/2r/adopted/2613worsley0147.doc.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/52leg/2r/bills/hb2613.hcom.1.asp
Roll Callhttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/52leg/2r/bills/hb2613.hrules.1.asp
Roll Callhttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/52leg/2r/bills/hb2613.hthird.1.asp
Roll Callhttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/52leg/2r/bills/hb2613.scwd.1.asp
Roll Callhttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/52leg/2r/bills/hb2613.sthird.1.asp
Roll Callhttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/52leg/2r/bills/hb2613.hfinal.1.asp

Bill Comments

feedback