AZ HB2600 | 2020 | Fifty-fourth Legislature 2nd Regular

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 28 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-03-03 - Senate read second time
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Adoption; original birth certificate; release

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Adoption; original birth certificate; release

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-02-27 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 53 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-27 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-20 - House - House Health & Human Services Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-03SenateSenate read second time
2020-03-02SenateAssigned to Senate RULES Committee
2020-03-02SenateAssigned to Senate JUD Committee
2020-03-02SenateIntroduced in Senate and read first time
2020-02-28SenateTransmit to Senate
2020-02-27HouseHouse third reading PASSED voting: (53-7-0-0)
2020-02-27HouseHouse Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
2020-02-26HouseHouse minority caucus: Do pass
2020-02-26HouseHouse majority caucus: Do pass
2020-02-25HouseHouse Committee of the Whole consent calendar
2020-02-25HouseHouse RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (7-0-0-1-0-0)
2020-02-20HouseHouse HHS Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (9-0-0-0-0-0)
2020-02-13HouseHouse read second time
2020-02-12HouseAssigned to House RULES Committee
2020-02-12HouseAssigned to House HHS Committee
2020-02-12HouseIntroduced in House and read first time

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
36322Amended CodeSee Bill Text
36336Amended CodeSee Bill Text
36337Amended CodeSee Bill Text
36340New CodeSee Bill Text
8106Amended CodeSee Bill Text
8121Amended CodeSee Bill Text
8534Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Arizona State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/BillOverview/73293
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/2r/bills/hb2600p.htm
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/2r/bills/hb2600h.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/2r/proposed/h.2600barto.docx.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/2r/adopted/h.2600health human services.docx.htm
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=73293&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#0
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=73293&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#1
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=73293&billStatusActionId=194597&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=73293&billStatusActionId=194682&includeVotes=true

Bill Comments

feedback