AZ HB2589 | 2020 | Fifty-fourth Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 27 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-03 - Senate read second time
Pending: Senate Government Institutions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 27 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-03 - Senate read second time
Pending: Senate Government Institutions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Land divisions; county regulation; surveys
Title
Land divisions; county regulation; surveys
Sponsors
Rep. Gail Griffin [R] | Rep. Tim Dunn [R] | Rep. Becky Nutt [R] | Sen. David Gowan [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-02-26 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 31 N: 28 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-26 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (RET ON CAL) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-24 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-13 - House - House Land & Agriculture Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-26 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (RET ON CAL) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-24 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-13 - House - House Land & Agriculture Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-03 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Assigned to Senate GOV Committee |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Transmit to Senate |
2020-02-26 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (31-28-1-0) |
2020-02-26 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2020-02-25 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Retained on the Calendar |
2020-02-24 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2020-02-24 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2020-02-24 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-0-0-0) |
2020-02-13 | House | House LAG Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (4-2-0-1-0-0) |
2020-01-28 | House | House read second time |
2020-01-27 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2020-01-27 | House | Assigned to House LAG Committee |
2020-01-27 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |