AZ HB2589 | 2018 | Fifty-third Legislature 2nd Regular

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 9-0)
Status: Passed on May 16 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-16 - Chapter 318
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Department of gaming omnibus

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Department of gaming omnibus

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-03 - House - House - Concurrence (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-03 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 51 N: 6 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-03 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 26 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-03 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-03 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-14 - Senate - Senate Government Committee Action (HELD) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-21 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 48 N: 9 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-21 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-19 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-02-13 - House - House Commerce Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-16SenateChapter 318
2018-05-16SenateGovernor Signed
2018-05-04SenateTransmitted to Governor
2018-05-04HouseHouse minority caucus: Conference
2018-05-04HouseHouse Conference Committee recommended
2018-05-03HouseHouse final reading PASSED, voting: (51-6-3-0)
2018-05-03HouseHouse concurs
2018-05-03HouseTransmit to House
2018-05-03SenateSenate third reading PASSED voting: (26-3-1-0)
2018-05-03SenateSenate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
2018-05-03SenateSenate minority caucus: Do pass
2018-05-03SenateSenate majority caucus: Do pass
2018-05-03SenateSenate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0)
2018-03-21SenateSenate GOV Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (6-1-0-0)
2018-03-05SenateSenate read second time
2018-03-01SenateAssigned to Senate RULES Committee
2018-03-01SenateAssigned to Senate GOV Committee
2018-03-01SenateIntroduced in Senate and read first time
2018-02-22SenateTransmit to Senate
2018-02-21HouseHouse third reading PASSED voting: (48-9-3-0)
2018-02-21HouseHouse Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
2018-02-19HouseHouse minority caucus: Do pass
2018-02-19HouseHouse majority caucus: Do pass
2018-02-19HouseHouse Committee of the Whole consent calendar
2018-02-19HouseHouse RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (6-0-0-3-0-0)
2018-02-13HouseHouse COM Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (9-0-0-0-0-0)
2018-02-07HouseHouse read second time
2018-02-06HouseAssigned to House RULES Committee
2018-02-06HouseAssigned to House COM Committee
2018-02-06HouseIntroduced in House and read first time

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
5101Amended CodeSee Bill Text
5103Amended CodeSee Bill Text
5104Amended CodeSee Bill Text
5104.01Amended CodeSee Bill Text
5104.02Repealed CodeSee Bill Text
5105Amended CodeSee Bill Text
5106Amended CodeSee Bill Text
5107Amended CodeSee Bill Text
5107.01Amended CodeSee Bill Text
5107.02Amended CodeSee Bill Text
5107.03Amended CodeSee Bill Text
5108Amended CodeSee Bill Text
5108.01Amended CodeSee Bill Text
5108.02Amended CodeSee Bill Text
5108.05Amended CodeSee Bill Text
5109Amended CodeSee Bill Text
5109.01Amended CodeSee Bill Text
5110Amended CodeSee Bill Text
5111.04Amended CodeSee Bill Text
5112Amended CodeSee Bill Text
5113Amended CodeSee Bill Text
5113.01Amended CodeSee Bill Text
5114Amended CodeSee Bill Text
5115Amended CodeSee Bill Text
5131Amended CodeSee Bill Text
5224Amended CodeSee Bill Text
5226New CodeSee Bill Text
5227Amended CodeSee Bill Text
5229Amended CodeSee Bill Text
5238Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Arizona State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/BillOverview/70828
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/2r/bills/hb2589p.htm
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/2r/bills/hb2589h.htm
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/2r/bills/hb2589s.htm
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/2r/laws/0318.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/2r/proposed/h.2589weninger.docx.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/2r/adopted/h.2589commerce.docx.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/2r/proposed/s.25890336.docx.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/2r/proposed/s.25890413.docx.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/2r/adopted/s.2589gov.docx.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/2r/adopted/s.2589borrelli0529.docx.htm
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=70828&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#0
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=70828&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#1
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=70828&billStatusActionId=181466&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=70828&billStatusActionId=181513&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=70828&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#2
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=70828&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#3
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=70828&billStatusActionId=183736&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=70828&billStatusActionId=183790&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=70828&billStatusActionId=183816&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=70828&billStatusActionId=183823&includeVotes=true

Bill Comments

feedback