AZ HB2586 | 2012 | Fiftieth Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-02 - House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-02 - House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Border warning; dissemination
Title
Border warning; dissemination
Sponsors
Sen. Katie Hobbs [D] | Rep. Peggy Judd [R] | Sen. Javan Mesnard [R] | Rep. Carl Seel [R] |
Roll Calls
2012-02-27 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-02-08 - House - House Military Affairs and Public Safety Committee Action (DP) (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-02-08 - House - House Military Affairs and Public Safety Committee Action (DP) (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-02 | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended | |
2012-02-28 | House majority caucus: Do pass | |
2012-02-28 | House minority caucus: Do pass | |
2012-02-27 | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (7-0-0-1-0) | |
2012-01-18 | Referred to House RULES Committee | |
2012-02-08 | House MAPS Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (6-1-0-2-0) | |
2012-01-19 | Referred to House MAPS Committee | |
2012-01-19 | House read second time | |
2012-01-18 | Assigned to House RULES Committee | |
2012-01-18 | Assigned to House MAPS Committee | |
2012-01-18 | Introduced in House and read first time |