AZ HB2578 | 2018 | Fifty-third Legislature 2nd Regular

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-3)
Status: Engrossed on February 23 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-03-22 - Senate ED Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (6-0-1-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Damaged school facilities; replacement; grants

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Damaged school facilities; replacement; grants

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-22 - Senate - Senate Education Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-22 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-22 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-19 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-02-12 - House - House Education Committee Action (DP) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-22SenateSenate ED Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (6-0-1-0)
2018-03-05SenateSenate read second time
2018-03-01SenateAssigned to Senate RULES Committee
2018-03-01SenateAssigned to Senate RULES Committee
2018-03-01SenateAssigned to Senate ED Committee
2018-03-01SenateIntroduced in Senate and read first time
2018-02-23SenateTransmit to Senate
2018-02-22HouseHouse third reading PASSED voting: (56-0-4-0)
2018-02-22HouseHouse Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
2018-02-19HouseHouse minority caucus: Do pass
2018-02-19HouseHouse majority caucus: Do pass
2018-02-19HouseHouse consent calendar
2018-02-19HouseHouse RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (6-0-0-3-0-0)
2018-02-12HouseHouse ED Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (10-0-0-1-0-0)
2018-02-07HouseHouse read second time
2018-02-06HouseAssigned to House RULES Committee
2018-02-06HouseAssigned to House ED Committee
2018-02-06HouseIntroduced in House and read first time

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
152033New CodeSee Bill Text

Arizona State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/BillOverview/70816
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/2r/bills/hb2578p.htm
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/2r/bills/hb2578h.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/2r/proposed/s.25781151.docx.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/2r/proposed/s.25780335.docx.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/2r/adopted/s.2578ed.docx.htm
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=70816&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#0
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=70816&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#1
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=70816&billStatusActionId=181604&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=70816&billStatusActionId=181652&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=70816&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#2

Bill Comments

feedback