AZ HB2578 | 2015 | Fifty-second Legislature 1st Regular
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 28-0)
Status: Passed on March 23 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-23 - Chapter 60
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 28-0)
Status: Passed on March 23 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-23 - Chapter 60
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Real property; purchaser dwelling actions
Title
Real property; purchaser dwelling actions
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-03-18 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 24 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-09 - Senate - Senate Commerce and Workforce Development Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-23 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 39 N: 19 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-16 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-11 - House - House Judiciary Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-09 - Senate - Senate Commerce and Workforce Development Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-23 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 39 N: 19 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-16 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-11 - House - House Judiciary Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-23 | Chapter 60 | |
2015-03-23 | Governor Signed | |
2015-03-19 | Transmitted to Governor | |
2015-03-18 | Senate | Transmit to House |
2015-03-18 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (24-5-1-0) |
2015-03-18 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass |
2015-03-17 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2015-03-17 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2015-03-16 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration |
2015-02-24 | Senate | Referred to Senate RULES Committee |
2015-03-09 | Senate | Senate CWD Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (7-0-1-0) |
2015-02-25 | Senate | Referred to Senate CWD Committee |
2015-02-25 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2015-02-24 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2015-02-24 | Senate | Assigned to Senate CWD Committee |
2015-02-24 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
2015-02-23 | House | Transmit to Senate |
2015-02-23 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (39-19-2-0) |
2015-02-19 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2015-02-17 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2015-02-17 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2015-02-16 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (9-0-0-0-0) |
2015-02-02 | House | Referred to House RULES Committee |
2015-02-11 | House | House JUD Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (4-2-0-0-0) |
2015-02-03 | House | Referred to House JUD Committee |
2015-02-03 | House | House read second time |
2015-02-02 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2015-02-02 | House | Assigned to House JUD Committee |
2015-02-02 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |