AZ HB2575 | 2024 | Fifty-sixth Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 1 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-04 - House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 1 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-04 - House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Homeowners' associations; powers
Title
Homeowners' associations; powers
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-04 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-29 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (RET ON CAL) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-28 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (RET ON CAL) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-27 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (RET ON CAL) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-21 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (RET ON CAL) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-20 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-15 - House - House Government Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-14 - House - House Government Committee Action (HELD) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-29 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (RET ON CAL) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-28 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (RET ON CAL) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-27 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (RET ON CAL) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-21 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (RET ON CAL) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-20 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-15 - House - House Government Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-14 - House - House Government Committee Action (HELD) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-04 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2024-02-29 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Retained on the Calendar |
2024-02-28 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Retained on the Calendar |
2024-02-27 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Retained on the Calendar |
2024-02-21 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Retained on the Calendar |
2024-02-20 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2024-02-20 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2024-02-20 | House | House consent calendar |
2024-02-20 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (9-0-0-0-0-0) |
2024-02-15 | House | House GOV Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (7-1-1-0-0-0) |
2024-02-05 | House | House read second time |
2024-02-01 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2024-02-01 | House | Assigned to House GOV Committee |
2024-02-01 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
Subjects
Hoa (see Also: Homeowner's Association)
Homeowners' Association (hoa)
Planned Communities
Powers
Property - Title 33
Homeowners' Association (hoa)
Planned Communities
Powers
Property - Title 33