AZ HB2570 | 2022 | Fifty-fifth Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 30 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-30 - Chapter 91
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 30 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-30 - Chapter 91
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Department of juvenile corrections; continuation
Title
Department of juvenile corrections; continuation
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-23 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-07 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-03 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee Action (DP) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-10 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 54 N: 2 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-07 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-02 - House - House Judiciary Committee Action (DP) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-07 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-03 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee Action (DP) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-10 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 54 N: 2 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-07 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-02 - House - House Judiciary Committee Action (DP) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-30 | Senate | Chapter 91 |
2022-03-30 | Senate | Governor Signed |
2022-03-24 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2022-03-23 | House | Transmit to House |
2022-03-23 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (28-0-2-0) |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2022-03-07 | Senate | Senate consent calendar |
2022-03-07 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2022-03-03 | Senate | Senate JUD Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (8-0-0-0) |
2022-02-21 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2022-02-17 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2022-02-17 | Senate | Assigned to Senate JUD Committee |
2022-02-17 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Transmit to Senate |
2022-02-10 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (54-2-4-0) |
2022-02-08 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2022-02-08 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2022-02-07 | House | House consent calendar |
2022-02-07 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-0-0-0) |
2022-02-02 | House | House JUD Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (9-0-0-1-0-0) |
2022-01-25 | House | House read second time |
2022-01-24 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2022-01-24 | House | Assigned to House JUD Committee |
2022-01-24 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
Subjects
Adjc (see Also: Department Of Juvenile Corrections)
Continuation
Department Of Juvenile Corrections (adjc)
Purpose (s)
Repeal (s)
Retroactivity
State Government - Title 41
Termination (s)
Continuation
Department Of Juvenile Corrections (adjc)
Purpose (s)
Repeal (s)
Retroactivity
State Government - Title 41
Termination (s)
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
41 | 3022.21 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text | |
41 | 3030.21 | New Code | See Bill Text |