AZ HB2569 | 2019 | Fifty-fourth Legislature 1st Regular

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 28-0)
Status: Passed on April 10 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-10 - Chapter 55
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Occupational licensing; reciprocity

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Occupational licensing; reciprocity

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-04 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 18 N: 11 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-03 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DP) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-25 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-21 - Senate - Senate Commerce Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-25 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 36 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-25 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-18 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-11 - House - House Regulatory Affairs Committee Action (DP) (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-10SenateChapter 55
2019-04-10SenateGovernor Signed
2019-04-08SenateTransmitted to Governor
2019-04-04HouseTransmit to House
2019-04-04SenateSenate third reading PASSED voting: (18-11-1-0)
2019-04-03SenateSenate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass
2019-03-26SenateSenate majority caucus: Do pass
2019-03-26SenateSenate minority caucus: Do pass
2019-03-25SenateSenate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0)
2019-03-21SenateSenate COM Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (7-0-1-0)
2019-02-28SenateSenate read second time
2019-02-27SenateAssigned to Senate RULES Committee
2019-02-27SenateAssigned to Senate COM Committee
2019-02-27SenateIntroduced in Senate and read first time
2019-02-26SenateTransmit to Senate
2019-02-25HouseHouse third reading PASSED voting: (36-24-0-0)
2019-02-25HouseHouse Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
2019-02-19HouseHouse minority caucus: Do pass
2019-02-19HouseHouse majority caucus: Do pass
2019-02-18HouseHouse consent calendar
2019-02-18HouseHouse RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-0-0-0)
2019-02-11HouseHouse RA Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (4-3-0-0-0-0)
2019-02-05HouseHouse read second time
2019-02-04HouseAssigned to House RULES Committee
2019-02-04HouseAssigned to House RA Committee
2019-02-04HouseIntroduced in House and read first time

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
324302Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Arizona State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/BillOverview/72039
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/1r/bills/hb2569p.htm
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/1r/bills/hb2569h.htm
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/1r/laws/0055.htm
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=72039&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#0
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=72039&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#1
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=72039&billStatusActionId=186774&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=72039&billStatusActionId=186830&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=72039&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#2
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=72039&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#3
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=72039&billStatusActionId=188745&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=72039&billStatusActionId=188812&includeVotes=true

Bill Comments

feedback