AZ HB2565 | 2014 | Fifty-first Legislature 2nd Regular

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Passed on April 30 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-30 - Chapter 270
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Manslaughter; assisting suicide

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Manslaughter; assisting suicide

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2014-04-23 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 19 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-22 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 17 N: 11 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-17 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee Action (DP) (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-25 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 41 N: 18 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-18 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-02-13 - House - House Judiciary Committee Action (DP) (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2014-04-30 Chapter 270
2014-04-30 Governor Signed
2014-04-24 Transmitted to Governor
2014-04-23HouseHouse final reading , voting: (35-19-6-0)
2014-04-23HouseHouse Concurrence PASSED, voting: (0-0-0-0)
2014-04-23HouseHouse minority caucus: Do pass
2014-04-23HouseHouse majority caucus: Do pass
2014-04-22SenateTransmit to House
2014-04-22SenateSenate third reading PASSED voting: (17-11-2-0)
2014-04-16SenateSenate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
2014-04-14SenateSenate majority caucus: Do pass
2014-04-14SenateSenate minority caucus: Do pass
2014-04-10SenateSenate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration
2014-02-26SenateReferred to Senate RULES Committee
2014-03-17SenateSenate JUD Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (6-1-2-0)
2014-02-27SenateReferred to Senate JUD Committee
2014-02-27SenateSenate read second time
2014-02-26SenateAssigned to Senate RULES Committee
2014-02-26SenateAssigned to Senate JUD Committee
2014-02-26SenateIntroduced in Senate and read first time
2014-02-25HouseTransmit to Senate
2014-02-25HouseHouse third reading PASSED voting: (41-18-1-0)
2014-02-25HouseHouse majority caucus: Do pass
2014-02-25HouseHouse minority caucus: Do pass
2014-02-18HouseHouse RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-1-0)
2014-02-11HouseReferred to House RULES Committee
2014-02-13HouseHouse JUD Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (6-2-0-0-0)
2014-02-12HouseReferred to House JUD Committee
2014-02-12HouseHouse read second time
2014-02-11HouseAssigned to House RULES Committee
2014-02-11HouseAssigned to House JUD Committee
2014-02-11HouseIntroduced in House and read first time

Arizona State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback