AZ HB2562 | 2021 | Fifty-fifth Legislature 1st Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 26 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-18 - House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 26 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-18 - House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Tax credit; affordable housing.
Title
Tax credit; affordable housing.
Sponsors
Rep. Regina Cobb [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-02-18 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-08 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-03 - House - House Appropriations Committee Action (DP) (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-08 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-03 - House - House Appropriations Committee Action (DP) (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-18 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2021-02-09 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2021-02-09 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2021-02-08 | House | House consent calendar |
2021-02-08 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-0-0-0) |
2021-02-03 | House | House APPROP Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (12-1-0-0-0-0) |
2021-01-27 | House | House read second time |
2021-01-26 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2021-01-26 | House | Assigned to House APPROP Committee |
2021-01-26 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
Subjects
Affordable Housing Tax Credit
Implementation And Administration
Insurance - Title 20
Insurance Premiums
Purpose
State Government - Title 41
Tax Credit
Taxation Of Income - Title 43
Implementation And Administration
Insurance - Title 20
Insurance Premiums
Purpose
State Government - Title 41
Tax Credit
Taxation Of Income - Title 43
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
20 | 224.04 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
41 | 3954 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
43 | 1075 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text | |
43 | 1163 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
43 | 222 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
43 | 225 | New Code | See Bill Text |