AZ HB2557 | 2012 | Fiftieth Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on May 9 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-09 - Governor Vetoed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on May 9 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-09 - Governor Vetoed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Wireless telecommunications carrier; records access
Title
Wireless telecommunications carrier; records access
Sponsors
Rep. Ted Vogt [R] |
Roll Calls
2012-04-30 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 18 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-25 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 17 NV: 7 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-04-19 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 27 N: 29 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2012-04-03 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 17 N: 12 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-20 - Senate - Senate Appropriations Committee Action (DPA/SE) (Y: 8 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-08 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-22 - House - House Rules Committee Action (AMEND C&P) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-02-15 - House - House Military Affairs and Public Safety Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-02-09 - House - House Transportation and Infrastructure Committee Action (DP) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-04-25 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 17 NV: 7 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-04-19 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 27 N: 29 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2012-04-03 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 17 N: 12 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-20 - Senate - Senate Appropriations Committee Action (DPA/SE) (Y: 8 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-08 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-22 - House - House Rules Committee Action (AMEND C&P) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-02-15 - House - House Military Affairs and Public Safety Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-02-09 - House - House Transportation and Infrastructure Committee Action (DP) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-09 | Governor Vetoed | |
2012-05-01 | Transmitted to Governor | |
2012-04-19 | House final reading , voting: (27-29-3-0) | |
2012-04-10 | House minority caucus: Do pass | |
2012-04-10 | House majority caucus: Do pass | |
2012-04-03 | Transmit to House | |
2012-04-03 | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (17-12-1-0) | |
2012-03-27 | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended | |
2012-03-26 | Senate majority caucus: Do pass | |
2012-03-26 | Senate minority caucus: Do pass | |
2012-03-26 | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration Amended | |
2012-03-12 | Referred to Senate RULES Committee | |
2012-03-20 | Senate APPROP Committee action: do pass amended/strike-everything, voting: (8-4-1-0) | |
2012-03-19 | Referred to Senate APPROP Committee | |
2012-03-19 | Senate PSHS Committee action: Withdrawn | |
2012-03-13 | Referred to Senate PSHS Committee | |
2012-03-13 | Senate read second time | |
2012-03-12 | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee | |
2012-03-19 | Assigned to Senate APPROP Committee | |
2012-03-12 | Assigned to Senate PSHS Committee | |
2012-03-12 | Introduced in Senate and read first time | |
2012-03-08 | Transmit to Senate | |
2012-03-08 | House third reading PASSED voting: (50-0-10-0) | |
2012-02-28 | House Committee of the Whole action: Retained on the Calendar | |
2012-02-27 | House majority caucus: Do pass | |
2012-02-27 | House minority caucus: Do pass | |
2012-02-22 | House RULES Committee action: amended constitutional and in proper form, voting: (6-0-0-1-0) | |
2012-01-17 | Referred to House RULES Committee | |
2012-02-15 | House MAPS Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (7-0-0-2-0) | |
2012-01-17 | Referred to House MAPS Committee | |
2012-02-09 | House TI Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (6-0-0-1-0) | |
2012-01-18 | Referred to House TI Committee | |
2012-01-18 | House read second time | |
2012-01-17 | Assigned to House RULES Committee | |
2012-01-17 | Assigned to House MAPS Committee | |
2012-01-17 | Assigned to House TI Committee | |
2012-01-17 | Introduced in House and read first time |