AZ HB2554 | 2021 | Fifty-fifth Legislature 1st Regular

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on May 28 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-28 - Governor Vetoed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Party representative; resident; violation

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Party representative; resident; violation

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-05-24 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 16 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-20 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DP) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-29 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-22 - Senate - Senate Government Committee Action (DP) (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-03-03 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 31 N: 28 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-01 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-23 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-17 - House - House Government & Elections Committee Action (DPA/SE) (Y: 7 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-05-28 Governor Vetoed
2021-05-28 Transmitted to Governor
2021-05-24HouseTransmit to House
2021-05-24SenateSenate third reading PASSED voting: (16-14-0-0)
2021-04-20SenateSenate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass
2021-03-30SenateSenate majority caucus: Do pass
2021-03-30SenateSenate minority caucus: Do pass
2021-03-29SenateSenate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0)
2021-03-22SenateSenate GOV Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (4-3-1-0)
2021-03-08SenateSenate read second time
2021-03-04SenateAssigned to Senate RULES Committee
2021-03-04SenateAssigned to Senate GOV Committee
2021-03-04SenateIntroduced in Senate and read first time
2021-03-03SenateTransmit to Senate
2021-03-03HouseHouse third reading PASSED voting: (31-28-1-0)
2021-03-01HouseHouse Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
2021-02-23HouseHouse minority caucus: Do pass
2021-02-23HouseHouse majority caucus: Do pass
2021-02-23HouseHouse RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (5-3-0-0-0-0)
2021-02-17HouseHouse read second time
2021-02-17HouseHouse GE Committee action: do pass amended/strike-everything, voting: (7-6-0-0-0-0)
2021-02-16HouseAssigned to House RULES Committee
2021-02-16HouseAssigned to House GE Committee
2021-02-16HouseIntroduced in House and read first time

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
161004Amended CodeSee Bill Text
16590Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Arizona State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/BillOverview/75199
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/55leg/1r/bills/hb2554p.htm
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/55leg/1r/bills/hb2554h.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/55leg/1r/proposed/h.2554kavanagh.docx.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/55leg/1r/adopted/h.2554government elections.docx.htm
Supplementhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/GetDocumentPdf/484407
Supplementhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/GetDocumentPdf/484807
Supplementhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/GetDocumentPdf/486119
Supplementhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/GetDocumentPdf/487396
Supplementhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/GetDocumentPdf/489903
Supplementhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/GetDocumentPdf/489910
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=75199&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#0
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=75199&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#1
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=75199&billStatusActionId=201945&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=75199&billStatusActionId=202647&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=75199&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#2
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=75199&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#3
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=75199&billStatusActionId=203770&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=75199&billStatusActionId=204216&includeVotes=true

Bill Comments 750

feedback