AZ HB2539 | 2017 | Fifty-third Legislature 1st Regular
Note: Replaces legislation SB1524
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 2 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-04 - House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 2 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-04 - House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Budget procedures; budget reconciliation; 2017-2018.
Title
Budget procedures; budget reconciliation; 2017-2018.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-04 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-03 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-05-03 - House - House Appropriations Committee Action (DP) (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-05-03 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-05-03 - House - House Appropriations Committee Action (DP) (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-04 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2017-05-04 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2017-05-04 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2017-05-03 | House | House read second time |
2017-05-03 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (5-2-0-2-0-0) |
2017-05-03 | House | House APPROP Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (8-5-0-1-0-0) |
2017-05-02 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2017-05-02 | House | Assigned to House APPROP Committee |
2017-05-02 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
Same As/Similar To
SB1524 (Replaces) 2017-05-12 - Chapter 307
Subjects
Appropriations
Budget Procedures
Budget Reconciliation
Department Of Administration
Department Of Emergency And Military Affairs
Department Of Transportation
Job Training
Joint Committee On Capital Review
Military Affairs And Emergency Management
State Government
State Highway Fund
Budget Procedures
Budget Reconciliation
Department Of Administration
Department Of Emergency And Military Affairs
Department Of Transportation
Job Training
Joint Committee On Capital Review
Military Affairs And Emergency Management
State Government
State Highway Fund
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
26 | 262 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
28 | 6994 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
41 | 791 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |