AZ HB2536 | 2020 | Fifty-fourth Legislature 2nd Regular

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 27 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-03-16 - Senate consent calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Telemedicine; health care providers

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Telemedicine; health care providers

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-16 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-11 - Senate - Senate Health and Human Services Committee Action (DP) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-26 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-26 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-24 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-13 - House - House Health & Human Services Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-16SenateSenate consent calendar
2020-03-16SenateSenate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0)
2020-03-11SenateSenate HHS Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (8-0-0-0)
2020-03-03SenateSenate read second time
2020-03-02SenateAssigned to Senate RULES Committee
2020-03-02SenateAssigned to Senate HHS Committee
2020-03-02SenateIntroduced in Senate and read first time
2020-02-27SenateTransmit to Senate
2020-02-26HouseHouse third reading PASSED voting: (59-0-1-0)
2020-02-26HouseHouse Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
2020-02-24HouseHouse minority caucus: Do pass
2020-02-24HouseHouse majority caucus: Do pass
2020-02-24HouseHouse Committee of the Whole consent calendar
2020-02-24HouseHouse RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-0-0-0)
2020-02-13HouseHouse HHS Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (8-0-0-1-0-0)
2020-01-29HouseHouse read second time
2020-01-28HouseAssigned to House RULES Committee
2020-01-28HouseAssigned to House HHS Committee
2020-01-28HouseIntroduced in House and read first time

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
363601Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Arizona State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/BillOverview/73238
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/2r/bills/hb2536p.htm
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/2r/bills/hb2536h.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/2r/proposed/h.2536shah.docx.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/2r/adopted/h.2536health human services.docx.htm
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=73238&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#0
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=73238&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#1
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=73238&billStatusActionId=194335&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=73238&billStatusActionId=194360&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=73238&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#2
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=73238&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#3

Bill Comments

feedback