AZ HB2532 | 2018 | Fifty-third Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 16 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-16 - Chapter 314
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 16 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-16 - Chapter 314
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Occupational regulation; municipalities; counties; hearings
Title
Occupational regulation; municipalities; counties; hearings
Sponsors
Rep. Kevin Payne [R] | Rep. Todd Clodfelter [R] | Rep. Drew John [R] | Rep. Ben Toma [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-05-03 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 17 N: 11 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-30 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 34 N: 23 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-09 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 18 N: 10 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-05 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-26 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-19 - Senate - Senate Commerce and Public Safety Committee Action (DPA/SE) (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-22 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 34 N: 22 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-22 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-21 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (RET ON CAL) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-19 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-02-14 - House - House Local and International Affairs Committee Action (DP) (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-30 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 34 N: 23 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-09 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 18 N: 10 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-05 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-26 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-19 - Senate - Senate Commerce and Public Safety Committee Action (DPA/SE) (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-22 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 34 N: 22 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-22 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-21 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (RET ON CAL) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-19 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-02-14 - House - House Local and International Affairs Committee Action (DP) (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-16 | Senate | Chapter 314 |
2018-05-16 | Senate | Governor Signed |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Senate final reading PASSED, voting: (17-11-2-0) |
2018-04-30 | House | House Conference adopted |
2018-04-30 | Senate | Transmit to Senate |
2018-04-30 | House | House final reading PASSED, voting: (34-23-3-0) |
2018-04-24 | House | House Conference caucus date |
2018-04-23 | Senate | Senate Conference adopted |
2018-04-23 | Senate | Senate Conference caucus date |
2018-04-19 | House | House Conference report: That the House accept the Senate amendments with exceptions and the bill be further amended. |
2018-04-18 | Senate | Senate Conference members: SMITH, BOWIE, PETERSEN |
2018-04-18 | Senate | Senate Conference appointed |
2018-04-17 | House | House Conference members: PAYNE, BLANC, RIVERO |
2018-04-17 | House | House Conference appointed |
2018-04-12 | House | House minority caucus: Conference |
2018-04-12 | House | House Conference Committee recommended |
2018-04-09 | House | Transmit to House |
2018-04-09 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (18-10-2-0) |
2018-04-05 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2018-03-27 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2018-03-27 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2018-03-26 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2018-03-19 | Senate | Senate COMPS Committee action: do pass amended/strike-everything, voting: (6-1-1-0) |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Assigned to Senate COMPS Committee |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
2018-02-23 | Senate | Transmit to Senate |
2018-02-22 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (34-22-4-0) |
2018-02-22 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2018-02-21 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Retained on the Calendar |
2018-02-19 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2018-02-19 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2018-02-19 | House | House consent calendar |
2018-02-19 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (6-0-0-3-0-0) |
2018-02-14 | House | House LIA Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (4-3-0-0-0-0) |
2018-02-07 | House | House read second time |
2018-02-06 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2018-02-06 | House | Assigned to House LIA Committee |
2018-02-06 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
11 | 1612 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
9 | 842 | New Code | See Bill Text |