AZ HB2530 | 2021 | Fifty-fifth Legislature 1st Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 28 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-24 - House Committee of the Whole action: Retained on the Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 28 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-24 - House Committee of the Whole action: Retained on the Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Liquor producers; equipment donations
Title
Liquor producers; equipment donations
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-02-24 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (RET ON CAL) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-22 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-16 - House - House Commerce Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-22 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-16 - House - House Commerce Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-24 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Retained on the Calendar |
2021-02-22 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2021-02-22 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2021-02-22 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-0-0-0) |
2021-02-16 | House | House COM Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (7-3-0-0-0-0) |
2021-02-01 | House | House read second time |
2021-01-28 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2021-01-28 | House | Assigned to House COM Committee |
2021-01-28 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |