AZ HB2523 | 2021 | Fifty-fifth Legislature 1st Regular
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 22 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-31 - Senate APPROP Committee action: do pass amended/strike-everything, voting: (5-4-1-0)
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 22 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-31 - Senate APPROP Committee action: do pass amended/strike-everything, voting: (5-4-1-0)
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Four-year degrees; community colleges
Title
Four-year degrees; community colleges
Sponsors
Rep. Becky Nutt [R] | Rep. Leo Biasiucci [R] | Rep. Russell Bowers [R] | Rep. Regina Cobb [R] |
Rep. Travis Grantham [R] | Sen. John Kavanagh [R] | Rep. Amish Shah [D] | Rep. Ben Toma [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-03-31 - Senate - Senate Appropriations Committee Action (DPA/SE) (Y: 5 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-03-18 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Action (W/D) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-16 - Senate - Senate Education Committee Action (HELD) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-22 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 57 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-18 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DP) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-15 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-09 - House - House Education Committee Action (DP) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-18 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Action (W/D) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-16 - Senate - Senate Education Committee Action (HELD) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-22 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 57 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-18 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DP) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-15 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-09 - House - House Education Committee Action (DP) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-31 | Senate | Senate APPROP Committee action: do pass amended/strike-everything, voting: (5-4-1-0) |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Senate FIN Committee action: Withdrawn, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Senate ED Committee action: Withdrawn, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2021-02-24 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2021-02-23 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2021-02-23 | Senate | Assigned to Senate APPROP Committee |
2021-02-23 | Senate | Assigned to Senate FIN Committee |
2021-02-23 | Senate | Assigned to Senate ED Committee |
2021-02-23 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Transmit to Senate |
2021-02-22 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (57-3-0-0) |
2021-02-18 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass |
2021-02-16 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2021-02-16 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2021-02-15 | House | House consent calendar |
2021-02-15 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-0-0-0) |
2021-02-09 | House | House ED Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (9-0-1-0-0-0) |
2021-02-01 | House | House read second time |
2021-01-28 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2021-01-28 | House | Assigned to House ED Committee |
2021-01-28 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
15 | 1401 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
15 | 1444 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
15 | 1444.01 | New Code | See Bill Text |