AZ HB2521 | 2018 | Fifty-third Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 9-4)
Status: Passed on April 17 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-17 - Chapter 242
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 9-4)
Status: Passed on April 17 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-17 - Chapter 242
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Vehicle size, weight and load
Title
Vehicle size, weight and load
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-04-11 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-11 - House - House - Concurrence (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-04 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-02 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-28 - Senate - Motion Motion to suspend a portion of Senate Rule 8A-3 for the purpose of returning House Bill 2521 to the calendar of the Committee of the Whole. Motion carried. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-12 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-06 - Senate - Senate Transportation and Technology Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-22 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-22 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-20 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (RET ON CAL) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-12 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-02-07 - House - House Transportation and Infrastructure Committee Action (DP) (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-11 - House - House - Concurrence (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-04 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-02 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-28 - Senate - Motion Motion to suspend a portion of Senate Rule 8A-3 for the purpose of returning House Bill 2521 to the calendar of the Committee of the Whole. Motion carried. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-12 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-06 - Senate - Senate Transportation and Technology Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-22 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-22 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-20 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (RET ON CAL) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-12 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-02-07 - House - House Transportation and Infrastructure Committee Action (DP) (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-17 | Senate | Chapter 242 |
2018-04-17 | Senate | Governor Signed |
2018-04-11 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2018-04-11 | House | House final reading PASSED, voting: (58-0-2-0) |
2018-04-11 | House | House concurs |
2018-04-10 | House | House minority caucus: Conference |
2018-04-10 | House | House Conference Committee recommended |
2018-04-04 | House | Transmit to House |
2018-04-04 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (30-0-0-0) |
2018-04-02 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2018-03-28 | Senate | Senate miscellaneous motion: Motion to suspend a portion of Senate Rule 8A-3 for the purpose of returning House Bill 2521 to the calendar of the Committee of the Whole. Motion carried. |
2018-03-13 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2018-03-13 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2018-03-12 | Senate | Senate consent calendar |
2018-03-12 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Senate TRANSIT Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (7-0-0-0) |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Assigned to Senate TRANSIT Committee |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
2018-02-23 | Senate | Transmit to Senate |
2018-02-22 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (56-0-4-0) |
2018-02-22 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2018-02-20 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Retained on the Calendar |
2018-02-13 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2018-02-13 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2018-02-12 | House | House consent calendar |
2018-02-12 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (7-0-0-2-0-0) |
2018-02-07 | House | House read second time |
2018-02-07 | House | House TI Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (6-2-0-0-0-0) |
2018-02-06 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2018-02-06 | House | Assigned to House TI Committee |
2018-02-06 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
28 | 1092 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
28 | 1103 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
28 | 1150 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |