AZ HB2521 | 2017 | Fifty-third Legislature 1st Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 9 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-02-20 - House minority caucus: Do pass
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 9 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-02-20 - House minority caucus: Do pass
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
TPT reform; contractors
Title
TPT reform; contractors
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-02-20 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-15 - House - House Ways and Means Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-15 - House - House Ways and Means Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-20 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2017-02-20 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2017-02-20 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (9-0-0-0-0-0) |
2017-02-15 | House | House WM Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (5-3-0-1-0-0) |
2017-02-13 | House | House read second time |
2017-02-09 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2017-02-09 | House | Assigned to House WM Committee |
2017-02-09 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
41 | 1516 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
41 | 1532 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
42 | 1103 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
42 | 5001 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
42 | 5006 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
42 | 5007 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text | |
42 | 5008.01 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text | |
42 | 5009 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
42 | 5010 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
42 | 5029 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
42 | 5032.01 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
42 | 5032.02 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
42 | 5040 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
42 | 5061 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
42 | 5075 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
42 | 5077 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
42 | 5151 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
42 | 5155 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
42 | 5159 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
42 | 5160 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
42 | 6001.01 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
42 | 6004 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
42 | 6102 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
43 | 1072.01 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
44 | 1263 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
49 | 290 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |