AZ HB2509 | 2022 | Fifty-fifth Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-24 - House Committee of the Whole action: Retained on the Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-24 - House Committee of the Whole action: Retained on the Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Racing; boxing; transfer; gaming commission.
Title
Racing; boxing; transfer; gaming commission.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-24 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (RET ON CAL) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-22 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (RET ON CAL) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-21 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-15 - House - House Commerce Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-08 - House - House Commerce Committee Action (HELD) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-22 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (RET ON CAL) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-21 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-15 - House - House Commerce Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-08 - House - House Commerce Committee Action (HELD) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-24 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Retained on the Calendar |
2022-02-22 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Retained on the Calendar |
2022-02-21 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2022-02-21 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2022-02-21 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-0-0-0) |
2022-02-15 | House | House COM Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (8-1-1-0-0-0) |
2022-01-25 | House | House read second time |
2022-01-24 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2022-01-24 | House | Assigned to House COM Committee |
2022-01-24 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
Subjects
Amusements And Sports - Title 5
Boxing
Conforming Legislation
Effective Date
Gaming Commission
Purpose
Racing
State Government - Title 41
Transferring Powers
Transfers
Boxing
Conforming Legislation
Effective Date
Gaming Commission
Purpose
Racing
State Government - Title 41
Transferring Powers
Transfers
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
41 | 3024.28 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text | |
41 | 3026.04 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text | |
41 | 3026.22 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text | |
41 | 3032.01 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
5 | 101 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
5 | 1201 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
5 | 1301 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
5 | 221 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
5 | 601 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text | |
5 | 602 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text | |
5 | 602.01 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text | |
5 | 603 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text | |
5 | 604 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |