AZ HB2508 | 2010 | Forty-ninth Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 22 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-04-07 - Referred to Senate RULES Committee
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 22 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-04-07 - Referred to Senate RULES Committee
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Property valuation; equalization calendar
Title
Property valuation; equalization calendar
Sponsors
Sen. Rick Murphy [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-07 | Referred to Senate RULES Committee | |
2010-04-07 | Senate FIN Committee action: Failed To Pass, voting: (2-6-0-0) | |
2010-03-24 | Referred to Senate FIN Committee | |
2010-03-24 | Senate read second time | |
2010-03-23 | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee | |
2010-03-23 | Assigned to Senate FIN Committee | |
2010-03-23 | Introduced in Senate and read first time | |
2010-03-22 | Transmit to Senate | |
2010-03-22 | House third reading , voting: (57-1-2-0) | |
2010-02-25 | House Committee of the Whole action: Retained on the Calendar | |
2010-02-22 | House Consent Calendar February 22, 2010 @ 2:00 PM with Objections | |
2010-02-23 | House majority caucus: Do pass | |
2010-02-23 | House minority caucus: Do pass | |
2010-02-22 | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-0-0) | |
2010-01-19 | Referred to House RULES Committee | |
2010-01-21 | House WM Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (6-0-0-2-0) | |
2010-01-20 | Referred to House WM Committee | |
2010-01-20 | House read second time | |
2010-01-19 | Assigned to House RULES Committee | |
2010-01-19 | Assigned to House WM Committee | |
2010-01-19 | Introduced in House and read first time |