AZ HB2503 | 2016 | Fifty-second Legislature 2nd Regular

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 17 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-17 - Chapter 298
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Psychologists; licensure compact

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Psychologists; licensure compact

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2016-05-07 - House - Third Reading (Y: 41 N: 14 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-25 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 20 N: 9 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-16 - Senate Health and Human Services Committee Action (DP) (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-29 - House - Third Reading (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-15 - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2016-02-09 - House Health and Human Services Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2016-05-17 Chapter 298
2016-05-17 Governor Signed
2016-05-09 Transmitted to Governor
2016-05-07HouseHouse final reading , voting: (41-14-5-0)
2016-05-04HouseHouse Concurrence PASSED, voting: (0-0-0-0)
2016-04-26HouseHouse minority caucus: Do pass
2016-04-26HouseHouse majority caucus: Do pass
2016-04-25SenateTransmit to House
2016-04-25SenateSenate third reading PASSED voting: (20-9-1-0)
2016-04-21SenateSenate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
2016-04-18SenateSenate majority caucus: Do pass
2016-04-18SenateSenate minority caucus: Do pass
2016-04-18SenateSenate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration
2016-03-09SenateReferred to Senate RULES Committee
2016-03-16SenateSenate HHS Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (5-2-0-0)
2016-03-10SenateReferred to Senate HHS Committee
2016-03-10SenateSenate read second time
2016-03-09SenateAssigned to Senate RULES Committee
2016-03-09SenateAssigned to Senate HHS Committee
2016-03-09SenateIntroduced in Senate and read first time
2016-02-29HouseTransmit to Senate
2016-02-29HouseHouse third reading PASSED voting: (59-0-1-0)
2016-02-17HouseHouse Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
2016-02-16HouseHouse majority caucus: Do pass
2016-02-16HouseHouse minority caucus: Do pass
2016-02-15HouseHouse RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (6-0-0-3-0)
2016-01-27HouseReferred to House RULES Committee
2016-02-09HouseHouse HEALTH Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (6-0-0-0-0)
2016-01-28HouseReferred to House HEALTH Committee
2016-01-28HouseHouse read second time
2016-01-27HouseAssigned to House RULES Committee
2016-01-27HouseAssigned to House HEALTH Committee
2016-01-27HouseIntroduced in House and read first time

Arizona State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.azleg.gov/DocumentsForBill.asp?Session_ID=115&Bill_Number=HB2503
Texthttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/52leg/2r/bills/hb2503p.htm
Texthttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/52leg/2r/bills/hb2503h.htm
Texthttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/52leg/2r/bills/hb2503s.htm
Texthttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/52leg/2r/laws/0298.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/52leg/2r/proposed/h.2503carter.doc.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/52leg/2r/adopted/h.2503health.doc.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/52leg/2r/adopted/2503biggs1052.doc.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/52leg/2r/bills/hb2503.hhealth.1.asp
Roll Callhttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/52leg/2r/bills/hb2503.hrules.1.asp
Roll Callhttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/52leg/2r/bills/hb2503.hthird.1.asp
Roll Callhttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/52leg/2r/bills/hb2503.shhs.1.asp
Roll Callhttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/52leg/2r/bills/hb2503.sthird.1.asp
Roll Callhttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/52leg/2r/bills/hb2503.hfinal.1.asp

Bill Comments

feedback