AZ HB2493 | 2017 | Fifty-third Legislature 1st Regular

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 1 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-01 - Chapter 234
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Drug overdose; review team; confidentiality

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Drug overdose; review team; confidentiality

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-04-25 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 51 N: 6 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-25 - House - House - Concurrence (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-20 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-30 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-27 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-22 - Senate - Senate Health and Human Services Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-21 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-21 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 52 N: 6 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-20 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-16 - House - House Health Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-01SenateChapter 234
2017-05-01SenateGovernor Signed
2017-04-25SenateTransmitted to Governor
2017-04-25HouseHouse final reading PASSED, voting: (51-6-2-0)
2017-04-25HouseHouse concurs
2017-04-24HouseHouse minority caucus: Conference
2017-04-24HouseHouse Conference Committee recommended
2017-04-20HouseTransmit to House
2017-04-20SenateSenate third reading PASSED voting: (28-2-0-0)
2017-03-30SenateSenate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
2017-03-28SenateSenate majority caucus: Do pass
2017-03-28SenateSenate minority caucus: Do pass
2017-03-27SenateSenate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0)
2017-03-22SenateSenate HHS Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (5-0-2-0)
2017-03-01SenateSenate read second time
2017-02-28SenateAssigned to Senate RULES Committee
2017-02-28SenateAssigned to Senate HHS Committee
2017-02-28SenateIntroduced in Senate and read first time
2017-02-22SenateTransmit to Senate
2017-02-21HouseHouse third reading PASSED voting: (52-6-2-0)
2017-02-21HouseHouse Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
2017-02-20HouseHouse minority caucus: Do pass
2017-02-20HouseHouse majority caucus: Do pass
2017-02-20HouseHouse RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (9-0-0-0-0-0)
2017-02-16HouseHouse HEALTH Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (9-0-0-0-0-0)
2017-02-13HouseHouse read second time
2017-02-09HouseAssigned to House RULES Committee
2017-02-09HouseAssigned to House HEALTH Committee
2017-02-09HouseIntroduced in House and read first time

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
321968Amended CodeSee Bill Text
321979Amended CodeSee Bill Text
362266Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Arizona State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/BillOverview/69505
Texthttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/1r/bills/hb2493p.htm
Texthttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/1r/bills/hb2493h.htm
Texthttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/1r/bills/hb2493s.htm
Texthttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/1r/laws/0234.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/1r/proposed/h.2493carter.docx.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/1r/adopted/h.2493health.docx.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/1r/proposed/s.2493barto.docx.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/1r/adopted/s.2493hhs.docx.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/1r/adopted/s.2493floorbrophy mcgee.docx.htm
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=69505&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#0
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=69505&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#1
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=69505&billStatusActionId=175377&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=69505&billStatusActionId=175254&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=69505&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#2
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=69505&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#3
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=69505&billStatusActionId=176781&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=69505&billStatusActionId=177101&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=69505&billStatusActionId=177207&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=69505&billStatusActionId=177217&includeVotes=true

Bill Comments

feedback