AZ HB2483 | 2023 | Fifty-sixth Legislature 1st Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 1 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-03-07 - Senate read second time
Pending: Senate Government Institutions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 1 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-03-07 - Senate read second time
Pending: Senate Government Institutions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Backyard fowl; regulation; prohibition
Title
Backyard fowl; regulation; prohibition
Sponsors
Rep. Kevin Payne [R] |
Roll Calls
2023-02-28 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 31 N: 28 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-28 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-27 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-13 - House - House Land, Agriculture & Rural Affairs Committee Action (DP) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-28 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-27 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-13 - House - House Land, Agriculture & Rural Affairs Committee Action (DP) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-07 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2023-03-06 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2023-03-06 | Senate | Assigned to Senate GOV Committee |
2023-03-06 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
2023-03-01 | Senate | Transmit to Senate |
2023-02-28 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (31-28-1-0) |
2023-02-28 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2023-02-27 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2023-02-27 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2023-02-27 | House | House consent calendar |
2023-02-27 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-0-0-0) |
2023-02-13 | House | House LARA Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (9-0-0-0-0-0) |
2023-01-23 | House | House read second time |
2023-01-19 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2023-01-19 | House | Assigned to House LARA Committee |
2023-01-19 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
Subjects
Backyard Fowl
Cities And Towns - Title 9
Counties - Title 11
Municipal And County Zoning
Prohibition
Regulation
Cities And Towns - Title 9
Counties - Title 11
Municipal And County Zoning
Prohibition
Regulation
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
11 | 820.04 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
9 | 462.10 | New Code | See Bill Text |