AZ HB2483 | 2015 | Fifty-second Legislature 1st Regular
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on April 6 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-06 - Chapter 217
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on April 6 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-06 - Chapter 217
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
School tax credit; classroom expenses
Title
School tax credit; classroom expenses
Sponsors
Rep. David Livingston [R] | Sen. Paul Boyer [R] | Sen. Karen Fann [R] | Rep. Mark Finchem [R] |
Rep. Jay Lawrence [R] | Rep. Bob Thorpe [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-03-31 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 41 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-30 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 17 N: 12 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-18 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 3 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-12 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 23 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-09 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-04 - House - House Education Committee Action (DP) (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-30 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 17 N: 12 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-18 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 3 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-12 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 23 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-09 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-04 - House - House Education Committee Action (DP) (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-06 | Chapter 217 | |
2015-04-06 | Governor Signed | |
2015-03-31 | Transmitted to Governor | |
2015-03-31 | House | House final reading , voting: (41-19-0-0) |
2015-03-31 | House | House Concurrence PASSED, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2015-03-31 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2015-03-31 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2015-03-31 | Senate | Transmit to House |
2015-03-30 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (17-12-1-0) |
2015-03-30 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2015-03-24 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2015-03-24 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2015-03-23 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration |
2015-03-16 | Senate | Referred to Senate RULES Committee |
2015-03-18 | Senate | Senate FIN Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (3-1-1-0) |
2015-03-17 | Senate | Referred to Senate FIN Committee |
2015-03-17 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2015-03-16 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2015-03-16 | Senate | Assigned to Senate FIN Committee |
2015-03-16 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
2015-03-13 | House | Transmit to Senate |
2015-03-12 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (35-23-2-0) |
2015-02-26 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2015-02-24 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2015-02-10 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2015-02-09 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (6-3-0-0-0) |
2015-01-29 | House | Referred to House RULES Committee |
2015-02-04 | House | House ED Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (5-2-0-0-0) |
2015-02-02 | House | Referred to House ED Committee |
2015-02-02 | House | House read second time |
2015-01-29 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2015-01-29 | House | Assigned to House ED Committee |
2015-01-29 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |