AZ HB2479 | 2018 | Fifty-third Legislature 2nd Regular

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Failed on May 1 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-01 - Senate read second time
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

TPT; digital goods and services

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

TPT; digital goods and services

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-01 - Senate - Senate Appropriations Committee Action (HELD) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-28 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 39 N: 19 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-28 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-27 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (RET ON CAL) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-22 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (RET ON CAL) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-21 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (RET ON CAL) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-19 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-02-14 - House - House Ways and Means Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-01SenateSenate read second time
2018-05-01SenateSenate APPROP Committee action: Held, voting: (0-0-0-0)
2018-04-30SenateAssigned to Senate RULES Committee
2018-04-30SenateAssigned to Senate RULES Committee
2018-04-30SenateAssigned to Senate APPROP Committee
2018-04-30SenateIntroduced in Senate and read first time
2018-03-01SenateTransmit to Senate
2018-02-28HouseHouse third reading PASSED voting: (39-19-2-0)
2018-02-28HouseHouse Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
2018-02-27HouseHouse Committee of the Whole action: Retained on the Calendar
2018-02-22HouseHouse Committee of the Whole action: Retained on the Calendar
2018-02-21HouseHouse Committee of the Whole action: Retained on the Calendar
2018-02-20HouseHouse majority caucus: Do pass
2018-02-19HouseHouse minority caucus: Do pass
2018-02-19HouseHouse RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (6-0-0-3-0-0)
2018-02-14HouseHouse WM Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (8-1-0-0-0-0)
2018-01-25HouseHouse read second time
2018-01-24HouseAssigned to House RULES Committee
2018-01-24HouseAssigned to House WM Committee
2018-01-24HouseIntroduced in House and read first time

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
425001Amended CodeSee Bill Text
425002Amended CodeSee Bill Text
425009Amended CodeSee Bill Text
425040Amended CodeSee Bill Text
425061Amended CodeSee Bill Text
425151Amended CodeSee Bill Text
425155.01New CodeSee Bill Text
425167Amended CodeSee Bill Text
426015New CodeSee Bill Text
441263Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Arizona State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/BillOverview/70534
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/2r/bills/hb2479p.htm
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/2r/bills/hb2479h.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/2r/proposed/h.2479ugenti-rita1.docx.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/2r/adopted/h.2479ways and means.docx.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/2r/proposed/s.2479fann1.docx.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/2r/proposed/s.2479fann 4.docx.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/2r/proposed/s.2479fann 453.docx.htm
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=70534&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#0
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=70534&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#1
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=70534&billStatusActionId=181344&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=70534&billStatusActionId=181574&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=70534&billStatusActionId=181909&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=70534&billStatusActionId=182062&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=70534&billStatusActionId=182114&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=70534&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#2

Bill Comments

feedback