AZ HB2479 | 2015 | Fifty-second Legislature 1st Regular
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 10 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-10 - Chapter 310
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 10 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-10 - Chapter 310
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Schools; financial revisions
Title
Schools; financial revisions
Sponsors
Sen. Paul Boyer [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-04-03 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-02 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 27 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-19 - Senate - Senate Education Accountability and Reform Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-23 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-16 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-04 - House - House Education Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-02 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 27 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-19 - Senate - Senate Education Accountability and Reform Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-23 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-16 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-04 - House - House Education Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-10 | Chapter 310 | |
2015-04-10 | Governor Signed | |
2015-04-06 | Transmitted to Governor | |
2015-04-03 | House | House final reading , voting: (56-0-4-0) |
2015-04-03 | House | House Concurrence PASSED, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2015-04-02 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2015-04-02 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2015-04-02 | Senate | Transmit to House |
2015-04-02 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (27-3-0-0) |
2015-03-30 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2015-03-26 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2015-03-26 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2015-03-26 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration |
2015-02-24 | Senate | Referred to Senate RULES Committee |
2015-03-19 | Senate | Senate ED Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (7-0-0-0) |
2015-02-25 | Senate | Referred to Senate ED Committee |
2015-02-25 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2015-02-24 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2015-02-24 | Senate | Assigned to Senate ED Committee |
2015-02-24 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
2015-02-23 | House | Transmit to Senate |
2015-02-23 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (58-0-2-0) |
2015-02-19 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2015-02-17 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2015-02-17 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2015-02-16 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (9-0-0-0-0) |
2015-01-29 | House | Referred to House RULES Committee |
2015-02-04 | House | House ED Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (7-0-0-0-0) |
2015-02-02 | House | Referred to House ED Committee |
2015-02-02 | House | House read second time |
2015-01-29 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2015-01-29 | House | Assigned to House ED Committee |
2015-01-29 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |